NM SB150 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Educational retirement changes
Title
Educational retirement changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Referred to House Education | |
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Assigned to House Education and then to House Labor & Human Resources | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Passed Senate (30-12) | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-25 | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |