NM HJM34 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (39-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] PASSED/S (39-0) SGND.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Study licensure in behavioral health care
Title
Study licensure in behavioral health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] PASSED/S (39-0) SGND. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DP | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DP-SPAC | |
2010-01-29 | [LD 9] SRC/SPAC-SRC | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] PASSED/H (64-0) | |
2010-02-04 | [LD 13] DP | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] HAFC |