NM HB268 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-15 - [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School district funding match waivers
Title
School district funding match waivers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Education |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Passed House (34-30) |
2013-03-01 | House | [LD 34] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Education |
2013-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Education and then to House Judiciary |