NM HB268 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] h/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] h/cncrd POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recycle plans in school districts
Title
Recycle plans in school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] h/cncrd POCKET VETO. | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (27-0) | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] DP/a | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP-SCONC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] SEC/SCONC-SEC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] PASSED/H (63-0) | |
2011-02-09 | [LD 23] DP/a | |
2011-01-26 | [LD 9] HEC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=268&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0268.pdf |