NM HB258 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
No Scanbacks & Instant Malt Liquor Coupons
Title
No Scanbacks & Instant Malt Liquor Coupons
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | [LD 20] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 45 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-12 | Senate | [LD 18] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Passed House (59-0) |
2018-02-10 | House | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Printed |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 3] Not Printed |