NM HB191 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - [LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Food & Healthcare Gross Receipts Offsets

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food & Healthcare Gross Receipts Offsets

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Action postponed indefinitely
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-02-12Senate[LD 18] Referred to Senate Finance
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Passed House (43-19)
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Floor amendment adopted
2018-02-10House[LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-02-07House[LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue
2018-02-07House[LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted
2018-01-24House[LD 2] HLELC
2018-01-24House[LD 2] HLELC and then to House Taxation & Revenue

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback