NM HB111 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - [LD 15] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-08 - [LD 15] SFC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Create disadvantaged community revolving fund
Title
Create disadvantaged community revolving fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] SFC API. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] DNP-CS/DP - PASSED/H (68-1) | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] DP-HTRC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] HCPAC/HTRC-HCPAC |