NM HB107 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.192.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.192.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal court fees for law enforcement
Title
Municipal court fees for law enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.192. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-12 | Senate | [LD 21] Assigned to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2013-02-22 | House | [LD 29] Passed House (61-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-15 | House | [LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-01-16 | House | [LD 2] Assigned to House Judiciary and then to House Appropriations & Finance |