NJ S651 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2027
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.89.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires family day care providers and certain household members to undergo criminal history record background checks.
Title
Requires family day care providers and certain household members to undergo criminal history record background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4262 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4262 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-09 | Senate | Approved P.L.2017, c.89. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A4262 (1R) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2027 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A4262 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S651 (2R)
A4262 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S651 (2R)