NJ S2027 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S651
Note: Carry Foward to future A4262
Note: Carry Foward to future A4262
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 26 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires family day care providers and certain household members to undergo criminal history record background checks.
Title
Requires family day care providers and certain household members to undergo criminal history record background checks.
Sponsors
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] | Sen. Joseph Pennacchio [R] | Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] |
Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2027 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2027 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A3238 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2027 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A3238 (Same As) 2014-05-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee