NJ A4262 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2027
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S651 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Substituted by S651 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires family day care providers and certain household members to undergo criminal history record background checks.
Title
Requires family day care providers and certain household members to undergo criminal history record background checks.
Sponsors
Rep. Elizabeth Maher Muoio [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] | Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S651 (2R) |
2017-03-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S651 (Same As) 2017-06-09 - Approved P.L.2017, c.89.
S2027 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
S2027 (Carry Over) 2014-06-26 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee