NJ S4007 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.315.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.315.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns matters related to operations and obligations of casino gaming properties and finances of Atlantic City.
Title
Concerns matters related to operations and obligations of casino gaming properties and finances of Atlantic City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 21 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5587 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5587 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.315. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (47-21-1) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A5587 (1R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-16) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5587 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4007 (1R)