NJ A5587 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S4007 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns matters related to operations and obligations of casino gaming properties and finances of Atlantic City.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns matters related to operations and obligations of casino gaming properties and finances of Atlantic City.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-20AssemblySubstituted by S4007 (1R)
2021-12-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-12-13AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-05-05AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4007 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.315.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback