NJ S2962 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3959
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Approved P.L.2019, c.10.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "Accountancy Act of 1997."
Title
Revises "Accountancy Act of 1997."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A935 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.10. |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Substituted for A935 (2R) |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A935 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by S2962 (1R)
A3959 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3959 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee