NJ A3959 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A935
Note: Carry Foward to future S2962
Note: Carry Foward to future S2962
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises "Accountancy Act of 1997."
Title
Revises "Accountancy Act of 1997."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Regulated Professions Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-1) |
2016-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3959 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3959 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A3959 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee