NJ S2766 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4073 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4073 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Union County as "Jerry Green Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Union County as "Jerry Green Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A4073 (1R) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4073 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.52.