NJ A4073 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Approved P.L.2019, c.52.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Union County as "Jerry Green Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates portion of State Highway Route 27 in Union County as "Jerry Green Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2766 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2766 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.52. |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2018-12-17 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted for S2766 (1R) |
2018-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2766 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A4073 (1R)