NJ S2316 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S387
Note: Carry Over of previous S353
Note: Carry Over of previous A1975
Note: Carry Over of previous S353
Note: Carry Over of previous A1975
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands role of temporary guardian to include arranging placement of alleged incapacitated person in appropriate, less restrictive environment.
Title
Expands role of temporary guardian to include arranging placement of alleged incapacitated person in appropriate, less restrictive environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-04-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2316 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A693 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S353 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1975 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A693 (Same As) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S353 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1975 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee