NJ A693 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S387
Note: Carry Over of previous A1975
Note: Carry Over of previous S353
Note: Carry Over of previous A1975
Note: Carry Over of previous S353
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands role of temporary guardian to include arranging placement of alleged incapacitated person in appropriate, less restrictive environment.
Title
Expands role of temporary guardian to include arranging placement of alleged incapacitated person in appropriate, less restrictive environment.
Sponsors
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A693 (Carry Over) 2021-12-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A1975 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2316 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S353 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A1975 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2316 (Same As) 2021-06-10 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S353 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee