NJ S1567 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3453

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-01 - Approved P.L.2019, c.38.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain employers to provide certain pre-tax transportation fringe benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain employers to provide certain pre-tax transportation fringe benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2425 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 50 N: 23 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-01SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.38.
2019-01-31SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-8)
2019-01-31SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-01-31AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (62-12-2)
2019-01-31AssemblyMotion To Table (Greenwald) (50-23-0)
2019-01-31AssemblyMotion To Aa (DiMaso)
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted for A2425 (1R)
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-10-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-09-27SenatePassed by the Senate (23-13)
2018-09-24SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-13SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-12SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2425 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S1567 (1R)
S3453 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback