NJ A2425 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3453

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S1567 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires certain employers to provide certain pre-tax transportation fringe benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires certain employers to provide certain pre-tax transportation fringe benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31AssemblySubstituted by S1567 (1R)
2018-12-17AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2018-12-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-12AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee

Same As/Similar To

S1567 (Same As) 2019-03-01 - Approved P.L.2019, c.38.
S3453 (Carry Over) 2017-12-04 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback