NJ S1488 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2732
Note: Carry Over of previous A2186
Note: Carry Over of previous A2186
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the restraint of prisoners during and immediately after childbirth.
Title
Prohibits the restraint of prisoners during and immediately after childbirth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2732 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A3214 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A2186 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A3214 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
A2186 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1488 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1488_I1.HTM |