NJ A3214 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2732
Note: Carry Over of previous A2186
Note: Carry Over of previous A2186
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the restraint of prisoners during and immediately after childbirth.
Title
Prohibits the restraint of prisoners during and immediately after childbirth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1488 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
S2732 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2186 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2732 (Carry Over) 2018-06-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A2186 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A3214 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3500/3214_I1.HTM |