NJ S1244 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S1130
Note: Legislation replaced by A644

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A664 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A664 (2R)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A664 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Approved P.L.2019, c.64.
S1130 (Carry Over) 2017-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A644 (Replaced by) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback