NJ S1130 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4506

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codifies the Judiciary's Foreclosure Mediation Program; dedicates monies from foreclosure filing fees and fines.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-14 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2017-12-04SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2017-12-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-02-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1029 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Passed by the Assembly (53-17-0)
A4506 (Carry Over) 2015-12-10 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback