NJ S1241 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1529
Note: Carry Foward to future A1651
Note: Carry Over of previous A3074
Note: Carry Foward to future A1651
Note: Carry Over of previous A3074
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boil water notices to be provided by certain public water systems via direct contact. *
Title
Requires boil water notices to be provided by certain public water systems via direct contact. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1241 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S1241 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3074 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2450 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S1241 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3074 (Carry Over) 2016-02-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2450 (Same As) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee