NJ A1651 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1670
Note: Carry Foward to future S2068
Note: Carry Over of previous A2450
Note: Carry Over of previous S1241
Note: Carry Foward to future S2068
Note: Carry Over of previous A2450
Note: Carry Over of previous S1241
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Pending: Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires boil water notices to be provided by certain public water systems via telephone, email or text message.
Title
Requires boil water notices to be provided by certain public water systems via telephone, email or text message.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1651 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A1651 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2450 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S1529 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1241 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1651 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2450 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
S1529 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
S1241 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1651 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2000/1651_I1.HTM |