NJ AJR86 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR226
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR126
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR126
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating fourth Wednesday in May of each year as "Crisis Professionals Day."
Title
Designating fourth Wednesday in May of each year as "Crisis Professionals Day."
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] |
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Rosy Bagolie [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR226 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
SJR126 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Senate (36-0)
SJR66 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
SJR126 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Senate (36-0)
SJR66 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading