NJ AJR60 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous AJR51

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Designates November of each year as "Food Pantry Donation Month" in New Jersey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates November of each year as "Food Pantry Donation Month" in New Jersey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-29 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-17SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-12-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR51 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SJR109 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback