NY A08978 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - approval memo.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - approval memo.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the council on the arts to have members from each of the ten regions of the state; allows members appointed prior to the effective date to complete the natural end of their term before appointments shall be made in accordance with such requirement.
Title
Requires the council on the arts to have members from each of the ten regions of the state; allows members appointed prior to the effective date to complete the natural end of their term before appointments shall be made in accordance with such requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-21 | Assembly | approval memo.66 |
2024-12-21 | Assembly | signed chap.629 |
2024-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2024-06-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-04 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1133 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7296A |
2024-05-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-05-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.433 |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | print number 8978a |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07296 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8978A