NY S06975 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the state inspector general to receive and investigate complaints of sexual assault in correctional facilities and other places operated by the department of corrections and community supervision for the confinement of persons; requires the state inspector general to establish protocol and procedures for such reports and investigations.
Title
Authorizes the state inspector general to receive and investigate complaints of sexual assault in correctional facilities and other places operated by the department of corrections and community supervision for the confinement of persons; requires the state inspector general to establish protocol and procedures for such reports and investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-22 - Senate - Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2024-02-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-29 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.209 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1226 |
2023-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A08820 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - referred to governmental operations