NJ AJR51 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR60
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR109
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR55
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR109
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR55
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates November of each year as "Food Pantry Donation Month" in New Jersey.
Title
Designates November of each year as "Food Pantry Donation Month" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR51 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR51 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR55 (Carry Over) 2014-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
AJR51 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
AJR55 (Carry Over) 2014-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/AJR51 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/AJR/51_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR51 |