LA HB31 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Reported favorably.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the optional retirement plan and defined benefit plan for the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (RE SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)
Title
Provides relative to the optional retirement plan and defined benefit plan for the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana (RE SEE ACTUARIAL NOTE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 31 FINAL PASSAGE (#561) (Y: 84 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 14. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (11-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024. |
2024-01-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-25 | House | Prefiled. |