DE SB202 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-10)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Not Worked in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Not Worked in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
For claims for line of duty death benefits for covered persons, which include police officers, firefighters, auxiliary and volunteer ambulance and rescue company members, paramedics, and others, submitted on July 1, 2023, and thereafter, this Act increases the benefits for the beneficiary or beneficiaries from $200,000 to $375,000, payable in annual installments, with the maximum amount paid in any 1 calendar year being $50,000.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Line Of Duty Death Benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Not Worked in Committee | |
2024-03-14 | Amendment HA 1 to SB 202 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2024-01-24 | Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce Committee in House | |
2024-01-23 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-01-17 | Reported Out of Committee (Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology) in Senate with 6 Favorable | |
2024-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Banking, Business, Insurance & Technology Committee in Senate |