NJ AJR100 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, JR-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates first week in August of each year as "Coast Guard Week" and honors Cape May as U.S. Coast Guard's enlisted accession point and recruit training center.
Title
Designates first week in August of each year as "Coast Guard Week" and honors Cape May as U.S. Coast Guard's enlisted accession point and recruit training center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For Sjr70 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2015, JR-13. |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Substituted for SJR70 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR70 (Same As) 2015-12-07 - Substituted by AJR100
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/AJR100 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/AJR/100_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AJR100 |