NJ A674 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5213
Note: Carry Over of previous S3238
Note: Carry Over of previous S3238
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.39.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1646 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1646 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.39. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Substituted for S1646 |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5213 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3238 (2R)
S3238 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S1646 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A674 (1R)
S3238 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S1646 (Same As) 2022-06-16 - Substituted by A674 (1R)