FL S0494 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring an institution of higher education to waive certain examination requirements for a servicemember who applies for admission to a graduate program that requires such examination, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Graduate Program Admissions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#19 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#832 (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate Rules (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Education Postsecondary (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-21 Vetoed by Governor
2024-06-17 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2024-03-06SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2024-03-06SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2024-03-06SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (582213)
2024-03-05SenateIn returning messages
2024-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 1
2024-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2024-03-04HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2024-03-04HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2024-03-04HouseAmendment 582213 adopted
2024-03-04HouseRead 2nd time
2024-03-01House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
2024-03-01HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (3/4/2024)
2024-03-01HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2024-02-01HouseIn Messages
2024-02-01SenateImmediately certified
2024-02-01SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2024-02-01SenateRead 3rd time
2024-02-01SenateRead 2nd time
2024-01-30SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/01/24
2024-01-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2024-01-24SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2024-01-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/24/24, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2024-01-18SenateNow in Rules
2024-01-17SenateCS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
2024-01-16SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-01-16SenateCS/CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2024-01-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 01/16/24, 8:30 am, 301 Senate Building
2024-01-11SenateNow in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
2024-01-10SenateCS by Education Postsecondary read 1st time
2024-01-10SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2024-01-09SenateCS by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2024-01-09SenateIntroduced
2024-01-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 01/09/24, 4:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2023-11-28SenateReferred to Education Postsecondary; Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
2023-11-16SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H511 (Same As) 2024-03-04 - Laid on Table

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004032Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/BillText/c2/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Amendment/674090/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Amendment/582213/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.pre.he.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.he.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.pre.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.ms.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.pre.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.rc.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Analyses/2024s00494.hms.he.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Vote/2024-01-09%200430PM~S00494%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Vote/2024-01-16%200830AM~S00494%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Vote/2024-01-24%201100AM~S00494%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Vote/SenateVote_s00494c2006.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Vote/HouseVote_s00494c2832.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2024/494/Vote/SenateVote_s00494c2019.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback