NJ A5213 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A674
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3238 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3238 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S3238 (2R) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5213 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3238 (2R)
S3238 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S3238 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)