NJ S3238 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A674
Note: Carry Foward to future S1646
Note: Carry Foward to future S1646
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes New Jersey Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program.
Title
Establishes New Jersey Easy Enrollment Health Insurance Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. John McKeon [D] | Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5213 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5213 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (39-0) |
2021-11-08 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5213 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Ruiz) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3238 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S3238 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A5213 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3238 (2R)
S3238 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A5213 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3238 (2R)