IL HB1377 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0793
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Creates a homestead exemption for eligible property that contains a single family residence that was built no earlier than January 1, 2021 by a municipality and was sold to a private homeowner before January 1, 2035. Provides that the exemption applies for a 10-year period beginning with the tax year following the year in which the property is first sold by the municipality to a private homeowner. Sets forth the amount of the exemption. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-NEW RESIDENTIAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0793 |
2024-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2024 |
2024-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled |
2024-04-04 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 015-001-001 |
2024-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported Back To Revenue & Finance Committee; |
2024-04-04 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2023-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2023-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar González, Jr. |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-09 | House | To Revenue - Property Tax Subcommittee |
2023-03-02 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aarón M. Ortíz |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Hoan Huynh |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernández |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norma Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-179 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 9-275 | Amended Code | Citation Text |