NJ A6070 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4094 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4094 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to film and digital media content production tax credit program.
Title
Makes changes to film and digital media content production tax credit program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S4094 (2R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-06 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4094 (Same As) 2022-01-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.367.