NJ S4094 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.367.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.367.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes changes to film and digital media content production tax credit program.
Title
Makes changes to film and digital media content production tax credit program.
Sponsors
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Sen. Paul Moriarty [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6070 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A6070 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.367. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (31-2) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-12-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted for A6070 (2R) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Chiaravalloti) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-5) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6070 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S4094 (2R)