NJ A5896 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2391
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3948
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3948
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes supplemental State aid to school districts receiving certain federal Impact Aid; makes appropriation.
Title
Authorizes supplemental State aid to school districts receiving certain federal Impact Aid; makes appropriation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted by S3948 |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5896 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3948
S3948 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.283.
S3948 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.283.