NJ A2391 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3290
Note: Carry Over of previous A1914
Note: Carry Over of previous A5896
Note: Carry Over of previous S2788
Note: Carry Over of previous A1914
Note: Carry Over of previous A5896
Note: Carry Over of previous S2788
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain senior citizens to apply for rent increase limit.
Title
Allows certain senior citizens to apply for rent increase limit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2391 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A1914 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A5896 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3948
S2788 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A1914 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A5896 (Carry Over) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3948
S2788 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2391 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2500/2391_I1.HTM |