NJ S2788 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2391
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental payments to long-term care facility staff providing direct care services during COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Provides supplemental payments to long-term care facility staff providing direct care services during COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] |
Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4479 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Senate | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-1-1) |
2020-09-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A4479 (1R) |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2788 (Carry Over) 2020-11-09 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A4479 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2788 (1R)
A4479 (Same As) 2020-09-24 - Substituted by S2788 (1R)