NJ A5586 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1915
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S48 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S48 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns juvenile incarceration and parole.
Title
Concerns juvenile incarceration and parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S48 (3R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5586 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S48 (3R)
S48 (Same As) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.363.
S48 (Same As) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.363.