NJ S48 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1915
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.363.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.363.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns juvenile incarceration and parole.
Title
Concerns juvenile incarceration and parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5586 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5586 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.363. |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (55-19-0) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A5586 (ACS/1R) |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-9) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senate Amendment (23-0) (Pou) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Pou) |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S48 (Carry Over) 2020-01-20 - Approved P.L.2019, c.363.
A5586 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S48 (3R)
A5586 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S48 (3R)