NJ A2286 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.357.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.357.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to provide graduating students with information on income-contingent student loan repayment programs.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to provide graduating students with information on income-contingent student loan repayment programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1823 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1823 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.357. |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2021-12-02 | Senate | Substituted for S1823 (1R) |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1823 (Same As) 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A2286 (2R)