NJ S1823 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A2286 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-02 - Substituted by A2286 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires institutions of higher education to provide graduating students with information on income-contingent student loan repayment programs.
Title
Requires institutions of higher education to provide graduating students with information on income-contingent student loan repayment programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-02 | Senate | Substituted by A2286 (2R) |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2286 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.357.