NJ A2254 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1157
Note: Carry Over of previous A2330
Note: Carry Over of previous S1775
Note: Carry Over of previous A2330
Note: Carry Over of previous S1775
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Medicaid preferred drug lists to provide for coverage of buprenorphine for treatment of chronic pain.
Title
Requires Medicaid preferred drug lists to provide for coverage of buprenorphine for treatment of chronic pain.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2254 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
A2330 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1775 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2179 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2330 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S1775 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2179 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A2254 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A2500/2254_I1.HTM |